House | 04/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 372 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 592 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 394 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |