House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |