House
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-101
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
File Number 789
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7293
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
File Number 458
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
House Calendar Number 319
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|