House | 07/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2017 | Public Act 17-102 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 436 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | File Number 635 | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | House Calendar Number 406 | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |