House | 06/07/2017 | House Rejected Bill | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8669 | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | File Number 701 | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | House Calendar Number 457 | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |