House | 05/09/2017 | File Number 733 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 494 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |