Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Public Act 17-213
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 553
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
File Number 431
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 304
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|