House | 04/04/2017 | File Number 398 | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | House Calendar Number 293 | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |