House | 06/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Public Act 17-30 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 267 | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 335 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 251 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |