House | 05/16/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Public Act 17-3 | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 365 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | File Number 462 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | House Calendar Number 323 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |