House | 04/24/2017 | File Number 689 | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | House Calendar Number 449 | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |