Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07264 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7264
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 4772
33 *04772_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 7264
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 4772
1515
1616 *04772_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT REQUIRING LEGISLATIVE APPROVAL FOR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ADDITIONAL FIRST FIVE PLUS PROGRAM BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 32-4l of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
2929
3030 (a) (1) The Department of Economic and Community Development shall establish a first five plus program to encourage business expansion and job creation. As part of said program, the department may provide substantial financial assistance to up to twenty eligible business development projects by June 30, 2019.
3131
3232 (2) A business development project eligible for financial assistance under the first five plus program shall commit, in the manner prescribed by the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, to (A) create not less than two hundred new jobs within twenty-four months from the date such application is approved; or (B) invest not less than twenty-five million dollars and create not less than two hundred new jobs not later than five years after the date such application is approved.
3333
3434 (3) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development may give preference to a business development project that (A) involves the relocation of an out-of-state or international manufacturer or corporate headquarters, (B) involves the relocation of jobs involved in research, invention or innovation to the state, (C) is a redevelopment project that the commissioner believes will create jobs sooner than the schedule set forth in subdivision (2) of this subsection, (D) is located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, or (E) involves a targeted industry referenced in the economic development strategic plan for the state prepared pursuant to section 32-1o.
3535
3636 (4) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development may, in awarding financial assistance to an eligible business development project, work with Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, to secure financing for such project.
3737
3838 (5) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall certify to the Governor for his or her approval that a business development project applicant has satisfied all the eligibility criteria in the program. Financial assistance awarded through the first five plus program shall be with the written consent of the Governor.
3939
4040 (b) Financial assistance for the first five plus program for eligible business development projects shall be exempt from the provisions of subsection (c) of section 32-223, section 32-462, subsection (q) of section 32-9t and, at the commissioner's discretion, section 12-211a for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2012, June 30, 2013, June 30, 2014, June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016, June 30, 2017, June 30, 2018, June 30, 2019, and June 30, 2020.
4141
4242 (c) The commissioner may take such action as the commissioner deems necessary or appropriate to enforce such commitment, including, but not limited to, establishing terms and conditions for the repayment of any financial assistance awarded pursuant to the provisions of this section.
4343
4444 (d) On or before September 1, 2013, January 1, 2014, September 1, 2014, January 1, 2015, September 1, 2015, January 1, 2016, September 1, 2016, January 1, 2017, September 1, 2017, January 1, 2018, September 1, 2018, January 1, 2019, and September 1, 2019, the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall report in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and finance, revenue and bonding on the projects funded through the first five plus program, the number of jobs created and the impact on the economy of this state.
4545
4646 (e) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, on or after the effective date of this section, the department shall not provide financial assistance to any additional business development project under this section until: (1) The commissioner submits a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and finance that (A) includes the net rate of return to the state for the entire portfolio of the first five plus program, taking into account all loans that have been forgiven and all tax credits that have been allowed in accordance with this section, and (B) based on such net rate of return, makes a recommendation that the first five plus program should continue; and (2) said joint standing committees vote, in concurrence, to approve such recommendation. If a committee does not convene a meeting to vote to approve or disapprove such recommendation within thirty days after the commissioner submits such recommendation, such recommendation shall be deemed approved by such committee.
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5252 Section 1 from passage 32-4l
5353
5454 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5555
5656 Section 1
5757
5858 from passage
5959
6060 32-4l
6161
6262 Statement of Purpose:
6363
6464 To require, prior to the provision of financial assistance to any additional first five plus business development project, the legislative commerce and finance committees to approve the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development's recommendation to continue the first five plus program.
6565
6666 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]