Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07265 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7265
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 4842
33 *04842_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 7265
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 4842
1515
1616 *04842_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING AN EXEMPTION FROM THE ADMISSIONS TAX FOR CERTAIN ATHLETIC EVENTS AT THE BALLPARK AT HARBOR YARD AND EVENTS AT THE OAKDALE THEATRE.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 12-541 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):
2929
3030 (a) There is hereby imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any place of amusement, entertainment or recreation, except that no tax shall be imposed with respect to any admission charge (1) when the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in the case of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not more than five dollars, (2) when a daily admission charge is imposed which entitles the patron to participate in an athletic or sporting activity, (3) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure exclusively to an entity [which] that is exempt from federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, or any subsequent corresponding internal revenue code of the United States, as amended from time to time, provided such entity actively engages in and assumes the financial risk associated with the presentation of such event, (4) to any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, [which] that, in the opinion of the commissioner, is conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity [which] that is exempt from federal income tax under [the] said Internal Revenue Code, provided the commissioner is satisfied that the net profit [which] that inures to such entity from such event will exceed the amount of the admissions tax which, but for this subdivision, would be imposed upon the person making such charge to such event, (5) other than for events held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, as described in subdivision (d) of section 17a-310, (6) to any production featuring live performances by actors or musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean Beach Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided such theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption from federal tax under Section 501 of [the] said Internal Revenue Code, (7) to any carnival or amusement ride, (8) to any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651, (9) if the admission charge would have been subject to tax under the provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 1999, (10) to any event at (A) the XL Center in Hartford, or (B) the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport, (11) [from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017,] to any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the Ballpark at Harbor Yard in Bridgeport, (12) to any event presented at the Dunkin' Donuts Park in Hartford, [or] (13) on and after July 1, 2017, to any athletic event presented by a member team of the Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the New Britain Stadium, or (14) to any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford. On and after July 1, 2000, the tax imposed under this section on any motion picture show shall be eight per cent of the admission charge and, on and after July 1, 2001, the tax imposed on any such motion picture show shall be six per cent of such charge.
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3636 Section 1 October 1, 2017 12-541(a)
3737
3838 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3939
4040 Section 1
4141
4242 October 1, 2017
4343
4444 12-541(a)
4545
4646 Statement of Purpose:
4747
4848 To exempt from the admissions tax certain athletic events at the Ballpark at Harbor Yard in Bridgeport and events at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford.
4949
5050 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]