Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07270 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/11/2017

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 7270
January Session, 2017  *_____HB07270ED____032717____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 7270 

January Session, 2017

*_____HB07270ED____032717____*

AN ACT CONCERNING THE EDUCATION COST-SHARING GRANT FORMULA FOR FISCAL YEARS ENDING JUNE 30, 2018, AND JUNE 30, 2019. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) There is established an education cost-sharing grant formula that equitably distributes state education funds to towns, and such formula shall include adjusted equalized net grand lists, as defined in section 10-262f of the general statutes, current student census data and measures of student need.

Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than thirty days after the effective date of this section, the Department of Education shall issue a request for proposals for the purpose of conducting an adequacy study of public school funding in the state. Such adequacy study shall include, but need not be limited to, (1) an examination and analysis of the cost of delivering educational services in the state, (2) an adequate amount for the foundation level, and (3) equity adjustments for student need weights, such as students who are below the level of poverty as determined under Part A of Title I of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act, 20 USC 6301 et seq., students who are eligible for free and reduced price lunches pursuant to federal law and regulations, students enrolled in Husky A, and students who are English language learners as defined in section 10-76kk of the general statutes. Not later than August 14, 2017, the department shall select a person, as defined in section 1-79 of the general statutes, that has expertise in public funding for education to conduct such adequacy study. 

(b) (1) Not later than December 14, 2017, such person shall submit an interim report on such adequacy study to the State Board of Education and the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education and appropriations and the budgets of state agencies, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.

(2) Not later than February 14, 2018, such person shall submit such adequacy study to the State Board of Education and the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education and appropriations and the budgets of state agencies, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section
Sec. 2 from passage New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2017

New section

Sec. 2

from passage

New section

 

ED Joint Favorable Subst.

ED

Joint Favorable Subst.