House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Public Act 17-237
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 591
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8534
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
File Number 555
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
House Calendar Number 370
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|