House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 607 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8807 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8803 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8759 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | File Number 463 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | House Calendar Number 324 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |