House | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Public Act 17-221 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 483 | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | File Number 705 | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | House Calendar Number 461 | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Public Hearing 03/27 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |