House
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Public Act 17-222
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 612
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
File Number 713
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
File Number 559
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
House Calendar Number 375
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|