House
|
07/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-107
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
File Number 754
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 441
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6676
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
File Number 560
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
House Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|