House | 05/16/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | File Number 515 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 355 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |