House | 04/20/2017 | File Number 664 | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 429 | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Public Hearing 03/27 | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |