House | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Public Act 17-224 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 606 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | File Number 665 | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | House Calendar Number 430 | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Public Hearing 03/27 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |