Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Public Act 17-225
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
File Number 819
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8067
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
File Number 666
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
House Calendar Number 431
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/27
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|