House | 07/11/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/29/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Public Act 17-226 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 481 | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | File Number 734 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 495 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Public Hearing 04/11 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |