House | 05/10/2017 | File Number 743 | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | House Calendar Number 500 | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Public Hearing 04/17 | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |