Senate | 06/07/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Special Act 17-3 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 546 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Emergency Certification |