House | 01/31/2018 | Senate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled | ||
House | 01/31/2018 | Senate Reconsidered | ||
Senate | 01/31/2018 | Veto Overruled, House | ||
House | 01/31/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 01/31/2018 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | Vetoed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 01/12/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 01/12/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 01/11/2018 | Public Act 17-1 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 01/08/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 01/03/2018 | Emergency Certification |