House | 02/01/2017 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | File Number 4 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 23 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/01/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 01/24/2017 | House Favorable | ||
House | 01/13/2017 | Public Hearing 01/24 | ||
House | 01/10/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/09/2017 | Filed with House Clerks 12/19 |