House | 02/01/2017 | House Rejected Resolution | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Unfavorable Report, Accepted by House | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | File Number 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | House Calendar Number 21 | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Unfavorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/24/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 01/24/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office - Unfavorable | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Motion Failed HF | ||
House | 01/13/2017 | Public Hearing 01/23 | ||
House | 01/11/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2017 | Filed with House Clerks 01/06 |