Senate | 06/06/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 8372 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 236 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 153 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |