Senate | 04/11/2017 | File Number 517 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 273 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |