Senate | 05/23/2017 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | File Number 466 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 247 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |