Senate
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Public Act 17-73
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Calendar Number 616
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8137
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
File Number 467
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 241
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|