Senate | 04/03/2017 | File Number 365 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 194 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |