Senate | 03/10/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |