Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 515 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 237 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 145 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |