Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 81 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | File Number 60 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Vote to Draft |