Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | File Number 140 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 118 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |