Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-174
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 587
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7785
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
File Number 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 221
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Public Hearing 01/30
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|