Senate | 05/09/2017 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | File Number 468 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 242 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |