Senate
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Public Act 17-74
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Bill Passed Temporary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6222
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 141
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 119
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|