Senate | 06/07/2017 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 8873 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | File Number 773 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | File Number 31 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 66 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 01/26/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2017 | Vote to Draft |