Senate
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Public Act 17-75
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 465
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6674
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
File Number 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 131
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Public Hearing 01/31
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|