Senate | 05/31/2017 | House Calendar Number 611 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 238 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 141 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/08 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Vote to Draft |