Senate | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Change of Reference to Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |