Senate | 06/07/2017 | House Calendar Number 660 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8930 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | File Number 434 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 236 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |