Senate | 06/07/2017 | Bill Passed Temporary | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 626 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8234 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | File Number 336 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 186 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |