Senate | 05/19/2017 | House Calendar Number 519 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7238 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | File Number 402 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 223 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |