Senate | 05/17/2017 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | File Number 239 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 152 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |