Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2017
|
Special Act 17-7
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
House Calendar Number 520
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6267
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 518
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 292
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|